WI AB511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public hearing held
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 94.64 (1) (a); to amend 94.64 (3m) (a) (intro.), 94.64 (3m) (a) 1., 94.64 (9) (c), 94.65 (4) (a) (intro.) and 94.65 (4) (b); and to create 94.64 (1) (ag), 94.64 (1) (u), 94.64 (2) (f), 94.64 (3m) (a) 3., 94.65 (1) (bm), 94.65 (1) (fm) and 94.65 (5m) of the statutes; Relating to: the distribution and labeling of fertilizers and soil or plant additives produced from manure. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The distribution and labeling of fertilizers and soil or plant additives produced from manure. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenatePublic hearing held
2020-02-28SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Agriculture, Revenue and Financial Institutions
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:11 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2020-02-04HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Krug
2020-02-04HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-29HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-29HouseRepresentative Plumer added as a coauthor
2019-12-16HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-10-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-10-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback