WI AB531 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-12)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Published 3-3-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 118.169; and to create 39.54, 118.169 (title) and 118.169 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring that student identification cards include contact information for suicide prevention hotlines. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring that student identification cards include contact information for suicide prevention hotlines. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HousePublished 3-3-2020
2020-03-02HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-2-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 116
2020-02-25HousePresented to the Governor on 2-25-2020
2020-02-17HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-17-2020
2020-02-11HouseAction ordered immediately messaged
2020-02-11HouseSenate Amendment 1 concurred in
2020-02-06HousePlaced on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-01-31HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-21HouseReceived from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted)
2020-01-21SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21SenateRead a third time and concurred in as amended
2020-01-21SenateRules suspended
2020-01-21SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21SenateSenate Amendment 1 adopted
2020-01-21SenateRead a second time
2020-01-21SenateSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2020-01-21SenateSenate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Craig, Kooyenga, Stroebel, Kapenga and Nass
2020-01-17SenatePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-01-17SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-09SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-09SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-11-08SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-11-07HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-07HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-11-07HouseRules suspended
2019-11-07HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-07HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2019-11-07HouseRead a second time
2019-11-05HousePlaced on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-11-01HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-11-01HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2019-11-01HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2019-10-29HouseExecutive action taken
2019-10-28HouseRepresentative Bowen added as a coauthor
2019-10-28HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stafsholt
2019-10-24HouseRepresentative Kitchens added as a coauthor
2019-10-24HousePublic hearing held
2019-10-22HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-10-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-10-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-10-18HouseRepresentative Subeck added as a coauthor
2019-10-14HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2019-10-14HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback