WI AB536 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.235 (1) (fr), 20.235 (1) (fs) and 39.412 of the statutes; Relating to: establishing a career advancement scholarship program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Establishing a career advancement scholarship program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-03-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 24 (3)(a) |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-01-23 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-23 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2020-01-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren |
2020-01-02 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2019-12-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-12 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2019-10-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab536 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB536.pdf |