WI AB565 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.355 (1), 48.355 (2) (cm) 1., 48.357 (1) (am) 3., 48.357 (2v) (b), 48.357 (2v) (d) 1., 938.355 (2) (cm) 1., 938.357 (1) (am) 3., 938.357 (2v) (b) and 938.357 (2v) (d) 1.; and to create 48.21 (5) (e) 3., 48.357 (2v) (a) 5., 938.21 (5) (e) 3. and 938.357 (2v) (a) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: placement of a child with a relative under the Children's Code or the Juvenile Justice Code.
Title
Placement of a child with a relative under the Children's Code or the Juvenile Justice Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 64 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 64, Noes 34 |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-14 | House | Representative Milroy withdrawn as a coauthor |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 7, Noes 2 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ramthun |
2019-10-30 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2019-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-24 | House | Senator Feyen added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2019-10-23 | House | Introduced |