WI AB567 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.370 (6) (gs) of the statutes; Relating to: watershed enhancement in the village of Plover in Portage County and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Watershed enhancement in the village of Plover in Portage County and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Shankland |
2019-12-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-11-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2019-10-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab567 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB567.pdf |