WI AB576 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-5)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 445.095 (5); to renumber 445.095 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 445.095 (1) (a); to consolidate, renumber and amend 445.095 (1) (d) and (e); and to amend 445.045 (1) (d), 445.045 (1) (e) and 445.045 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: requirements for funeral director apprenticeships and licenses, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures. (FE)
Title
Requirements for funeral director apprenticeships and licenses, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, and providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 137 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | LRB correction |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative VanderMeer |
2019-12-03 | House | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2019-10-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-10-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2019-10-25 | House | Introduced |