WI AB578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.055 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: commercial driver license waiver for certain operation of commercial motor vehicles by farmers. (FE)
Title
Commercial driver license waiver for certain operation of commercial motor vehicles by farmers. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:19 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senator Larson added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Spiros |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-10-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab578 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB578.pdf |