WI AB592 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 167.31 (2) (d); and to create 167.31 (4) (fm) of the statutes; Relating to: the authority to shoot a wild animal causing damage to a highway.
Title
The authority to shoot a wild animal causing damage to a highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-28 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2020-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Edming |
2019-11-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-11-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab592 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB592.pdf |