WI AB596 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 709.03 (form) G4., G5., G6. and G7 and 709.033 (form) F10. and F11.; to amend 709.02 (1), 709.05 (1), 709.03 (form) F8. and 709.033 (form) E8.; and to create 709.03 (form) G4. and 709.033 (form) F10. of the statutes; Relating to: real estate disclosure reports.
Title
Real estate disclosure reports.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-14 | House | LRB correction |
2020-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-18 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2019-12-05 | House | Representative Brooks added as a coauthor |
2019-11-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2019-11-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab596 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB596.pdf |