WI AB600 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 33.22 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: bid requirements for public inland lake protection and rehabilitation districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bid requirements for public inland lake protection and rehabilitation districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseLaid on the table
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Swearingen
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:21 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2020-02-05HouseExecutive action taken
2019-12-04HousePublic hearing held
2019-11-15HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight
2019-11-15HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback