WI AB611 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Published 2-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Published 2-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 779.415 (1c), 779.43 (3) and 779.48 (2); and to create 779.41 (4) and 779.413 of the statutes; Relating to: liens on aircraft and aircraft engines.
Title
Liens on aircraft and aircraft engines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Published 2-22-2020 |
2020-02-21 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-21-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 103 |
2020-02-18 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-18-2020 |
2020-01-27 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-27-2020 |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-12-26 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-12-26 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Jobs and the Economy, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-12-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tittl |
2019-12-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-04 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2019-11-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs and the Economy |
2019-11-15 | House | Introduced |