WI AB627 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 36.25 (58) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for certain extension services of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding for certain extension services of the University of Wisconsin System and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-21SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 99, Noes 0
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:23 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2020-02-17HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-14HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2020-02-14HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 15, Noes 0
2020-02-11HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-11HousePublic hearing held
2020-02-10HouseRepresentatives Novak, Petryk and Plumer added as coauthors
2020-02-07HouseWithdrawn from committee on Colleges and Universities and referred to committee on Agriculture pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
2020-02-03HouseRepresentative Spreitzer added as a coauthor
2019-12-03HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-11-25HouseRepresentative Stubbs added as a coauthor
2019-11-21HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities
2019-11-21HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback