WI AB643 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 48.675 of the statutes; Relating to: qualified residential treatment programs, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Qualified residential treatment programs, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-12-05 | House | Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor |
2019-12-03 | House | Representative Kolste added as a coauthor |
2019-12-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab643 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB643.pdf |