WI AB648 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 49.46 (2) (b) 21. and 49.46 (2) (bv) of the statutes; Relating to: physical health services and acupuncture under Medical Assistance program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Physical health services and acupuncture under Medical Assistance program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 1 |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2020-01-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2020-01-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 10, Noes 4 |
2020-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2020-01-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Joint Committee on Finance |
2020-01-16 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2020-01-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-01-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2020-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren |
2020-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-07 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-06 | House | Representative Stuck added as a coauthor |
2019-12-06 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2019-12-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced |