WI AB650 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 46.482, 49.45 (30j) and 49.46 (2) (b) 14p. of the statutes; Relating to: reimbursement for peer recovery coach services under the Medical Assistance program and coordination and continuation of care following an overdose. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reimbursement for peer recovery coach services under the Medical Assistance program and coordination and continuation of care following an overdose. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-03HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 122
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-25HouseLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-27SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-27SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-01-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-01-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-01-21HouseRules suspended
2020-01-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-01-21HouseRead a second time
2020-01-16HouseRepresentative Petryk added as a coauthor
2020-01-16HousePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-01-16HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-16HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2020-01-16HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2020-01-16HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-01-15HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-13HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren
2020-01-08HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-06HouseRepresentative Stuck added as a coauthor
2019-12-05HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Substance Abuse and Prevention
2019-12-05HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback