WI AB652 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 23.33 (9) (bg); to amend 20.370 (5) (ct), 20.370 (5) (cu), 23.33 (1) (ng) 1. b., 23.33 (1) (ng) 1. h., 23.33 (1) (ng) 2. a., 23.33 (1) (ng) 2. b., 23.33 (1) (ng) 2. d., 23.33 (2) (b) 4., 23.33 (3) (em), 23.33 (4) (d) (intro.), 23.33 (6) (a), 23.33 (6) (f), 23.33 (6) (g), 23.33 (6r), 23.33 (9) (bb), 23.33 (9) (bg) (title), 340.01 (2g) and 346.02 (11); and to create 23.33 (1) (fe), 23.33 (1) (jd), 23.33 (1) (jqm), 23.33 (3) (ht), 23.33 (3g) (e), 23.33 (3g) (f), 23.33 (4z) (a) 3., 23.33 (6) (cd), 23.33 (6) (ch), 23.33 (6) (cp), 23.33 (6) (ct), 23.33 (9) (b) 7., 23.33 (9) (b) 8., 23.33 (9) (bc), 23.33 (9) (bg) 2., 23.33 (11m) and 971.19 (10m) of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles, all-terrain vehicle projects, and making an appropriation.
Title
Regulation of all-terrain vehicles and utility terrain vehicles, all-terrain vehicle projects, and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:25 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 8, Noes 3 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Felzkowski |
2019-12-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-12-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab652 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB652.pdf |