WI AB661 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 30.66 (3) (ar), 30.66 (3) (b) and 30.68 (5); and to create 30.50 (4d), 30.66 (3) (ar) 2., 30.66 (3) (b) 2. and 30.68 (5) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: exemptions to certain boating restrictions for operators of hydro-flight devices and operators of personal watercraft that assist in powering hydro-flight devices.
Title
Exemptions to certain boating restrictions for operators of hydro-flight devices and operators of personal watercraft that assist in powering hydro-flight devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-03-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Science and Technology, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2018-03-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Science and Technology, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2018-03-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Science and Technology, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Barca |
2018-02-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Barca |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2017-11-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab661 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB661.pdf |