WI AB661 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-7)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 60.61 (1m); to renumber and amend 17.25 (1); to amend 17.13 (3), 19.84 (1) (b), 60.30 (1e) (e), 60.307 (3) (b), 60.37 (4) (a), 60.61 (1m) (title), 62.23 (9) (title) and 70.47 (2); and to create 17.13 (2m), 17.25 (1) (a) 2., 60.30 (5) (c), 60.61 (1m) (b) and 62.23 (9) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: the way town board vacancies are filled; public notice requirements for governmental meetings; appointment and removal procedures for certain town officeholders; a process for an applicant to appeal a permit denial to the governing body of a city, village, or town; wages paid to an elected town officer who also serves as a town employee; and the term of appointed town assessors. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The way town board vacancies are filled; public notice requirements for governmental meetings; appointment and removal procedures for certain town officeholders; a process for an applicant to appeal a permit denial to the governing body of a city, village, or town; wages paid to an elected town officer who also serves as a town employee; and the term of appointed town assessors. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 140
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-25HouseLRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
2020-02-25HouseLRB correction
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
2020-02-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-19SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-19SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-18HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended
2020-02-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-18HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-18HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
2020-02-06HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Quinn
2020-01-28HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-28HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2020-01-23HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-03HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-12-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-12-12HousePublic hearing held
2019-12-12HouseRepresentative Duchow withdrawn as a coauthor
2019-12-05HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-12-05HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback