WI AB675 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 13.48 (3), 13.48 (6), 13.48 (7), 13.48 (10) (a), 13.48 (10) (b) 5., 13.48 (29), 13.488 (7) (a), 16.855 (14) (am), 16.855 (22), 16.87 (3), 20.924 (1) (a) and 20.924 (1) (b); and to create 16.855 (1g) (ec), 16.855 (1g) (em), 16.855 (14s) and 16.867 of the statutes; Relating to: projects included in the Authorized State Building Program, project approvals by the Building Commission, and selection of project architects and engineers. (FE)
Title
Projects included in the Authorized State Building Program, project approvals by the Building Commission, and selection of project architects and engineers. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 237 |
2018-04-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Technology and Consumer Protection |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-16 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 94, Noes 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-01-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-16 | House | Read a second time |
2018-01-12 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2018 by Committee on Rules |
2018-01-11 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2018-01-11 | House | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2018-01-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-12-22 | House | Representative Genrich added as a coauthor |
2017-12-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-11-28 | House | Introduced |