WI AB683 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 185.981 (4t), 185.981 (6) and 185.982 (3); and to amend 71.26 (1) (a), 71.45 (1) (a), 71.45 (5), 146.81 (1) (k), 146.997 (1) (d) 17., 155.01 (7), 185.09, 185.981 (title), 185.981 (1), 185.981 (2), 185.981 (3), 185.981 (4), 185.981 (5), 185.981 (7), 185.981 (8), 185.981 (9), 185.982 (1), 185.982 (2), 185.983 (1) (intro.), 185.983 (1) (a), 185.983 (1m), 185.983 (2), 185.985, 252.14 (1) (ar) 12., 254.11 (13), 632.86 (1) (a) and 655.002 (1) (f) of the statutes; relating to: health care plans operated by cooperative associations.
Title
Health care plans operated by cooperative associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-02-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-02-25 | Representative Suder added as a coauthor | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on calendar 2-25-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-05 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-05 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Health and Healthcare Reform, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-03 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-28 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Richards | |
2010-01-27 | Public hearing held | |
2010-01-22 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Healthcare Reform | |
2010-01-22 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab683 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB683.pdf |