WI AB69 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Representative Plumer added as a coauthor
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to consolidate, renumber and amend 283.31 (8) (a), (b), (c); and to amend 20.370 (4) (mi) of the statutes; Relating to: permit fees for concentrated animal feeding operations. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit fees for concentrated animal feeding operations. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseRepresentative Plumer added as a coauthor
2019-05-28HousePublic hearing held
2019-04-25HouseRepresentative VanderMeer added as a coauthor
2019-03-11HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback