WI AB691 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 70.32 (1); and to create 70.32 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting an assessor from changing the valuation of property based solely on a recent sale of the property. (FE)
Title
Prohibiting an assessor from changing the valuation of property based solely on a recent sale of the property. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Published 2-29-2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 114 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Edming added as a coauthor |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-30 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brooks |
2020-01-29 | House | Representative Hutton added as a coauthor |
2020-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-12-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2019-12-23 | House | Introduced |