WI AB692 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: funding for county snowmobile trails and areas and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding for county snowmobile trails and areas and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 141
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-19SenateSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-01-27SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-01-27SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-01-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-01-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-01-21HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0
2020-01-21HouseRules suspended
2020-01-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-01-21HouseRead a second time
2020-01-16HousePlaced on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-01-16HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-16HouseReport passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2020-01-16HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-15HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2020-01-15HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2020-01-15HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-15HouseRepresentative Quinn added as a coauthor
2020-01-07HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-07HouseRepresentative Pronschinske added as a coauthor
2020-01-07HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-12-23HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation
2019-12-23HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback