WI AB70 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-19)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-19)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to affect 2015 Wisconsin Act 116, sections 1m, 2m, 4m, 5m, 6m, 7m, 8m, 9m, 10m, 11m, 12m, 13m, 14m, 15m, 16m, 17m, 18m, 19m, 20m, 21m and 22m, 2017 Wisconsin Act 135, sections 14, 17 and 33 (3), 2017 Wisconsin Act 278, sections 19 and 25 (1) and 2017 Wisconsin Act 319, sections 3 and 6 (2); Relating to: the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact. (FE)
Title
The Interstate Medical Licensure Compact. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-05 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-07-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab70 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB70.pdf |