WI AB704 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 30.678 (1) (d); to amend 30.678 (1) (b) and 30.678 (1) (c) 2.; and to create 30.678 (1) (d) 2. of the statutes; Relating to: operation of motorboats by minors.
Title
Operation of motorboats by minors.
Sponsors
Rep. Tyler August [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
Rep. Cindi Duchow [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Published 2-29-2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 115 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-06 | House | Senator Marklein added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-03 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2020-01-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation |
2020-01-02 | House | Introduced |