WI AB71 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 948.12 (1m) (intro.), 948.12 (1m) (b), 948.12 (1m) (c), 948.12 (2m) (intro.), 948.12 (2m) (b), 948.12 (2m) (c) and 971.23 (11) (b); and to create 948.12 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: possession of child pornography and providing a penalty.
Title
Possession of child pornography and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-06-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-19 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2019-06-18 | House | Placed on calendar 6-20-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-06-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-06-18 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2019-06-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-05-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Tusler |
2019-04-23 | House | Senator Kooyenga added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab71 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB71.pdf |