WI AB713 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 289.63 (6) (d) 1. (intro.), 289.63 (6) (d) 2. a., 289.63 (6) (d) 2. b., 289.63 (6) (d) 3. a., 289.64 (4) (d) 1. (intro.), 289.64 (4) (d) 2. a., 289.64 (4) (d) 2. b., 289.64 (4) (d) 3. a., 289.645 (4) (h) 1. (intro.), 289.645 (4) (h) 2. a., 289.645 (4) (h) 2. b., 289.645 (4) (h) 3. a., 289.67 (1) (fj) 1. (intro.), 289.67 (1) (fj) 2. a., 289.67 (1) (fj) 2. b. and 289.67 (1) (fj) 3. a.; and to create 289.63 (6) (d) 1. c., 289.64 (4) (d) 1. c., 289.645 (4) (h) 1. c. and 289.67 (1) (fj) 1. c. of the statutes; Relating to: exempting certain waste-to-energy facilities from tipping fees. (FE)
Title
Exempting certain waste-to-energy facilities from tipping fees. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] | Rep. Jill Billings [D] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] |
Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] | Rep. David Bowen [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Quinn |
2020-01-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2020-01-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab713 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB713.pdf |