WI AB724 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 801.15 (1) (b) and 938.21 (1) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: hearing timelines for juveniles in custody. (FE)
Title
Hearing timelines for juveniles in custody. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:40 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Representative Bowen withdrawn as a coauthor |
2020-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Gundrum |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab724 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB724.pdf |