WI AB731 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 89.073 (2) (e) and 440.09 (2) (e); to renumber and amend 89.073 (1) and 440.09 (1); to amend 89.073 (title), 89.073 (2) (intro.), 89.073 (2) (a), 89.073 (2) (b), 89.073 (3), 440.09 (title), 440.09 (2) (b) and 440.09 (3); and to create 89.073 (1) (a), 89.073 (2) (f), 89.073 (4), 89.073 (5), 440.09 (1) (a), 440.09 (2) (f), 440.09 (4) and 440.09 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: reciprocal credentials for service members, former service members, and their spouses and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Reciprocal credentials for service members, former service members, and their spouses and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 143 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-30 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2020-01-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative VanderMeer |
2020-01-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-10 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2020-01-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2020-01-09 | House | Introduced |