WI AB74 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 125.51 (3) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: retail sales of intoxicating liquor for consumption off the licensed premises.
Title
Retail sales of intoxicating liquor for consumption off the licensed premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-03-27 | House | Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor |
2019-03-15 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-03-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab74 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB74.pdf |