WI AB742 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: emergency medical services funding assistance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Emergency medical services funding assistance and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Health and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab742 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB742.pdf |