WI AB743 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to: processing certain applications for farmland preservation agreements.
Title
Processing certain applications for farmland preservation agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Danou [D] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Sen. Pat Kreitlow [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-19 | Public hearing held | |
2010-04-15 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Danou | |
2010-03-08 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-02-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Agriculture | |
2010-02-12 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab743 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB743.pdf |