WI AB743 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.285 (1) (e) and 36.25 (54) of the statutes; Relating to: assisting University of Wisconsin System students in securing internships with businesses and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Assisting University of Wisconsin System students in securing internships with businesses and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Universities and Technical Colleges |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 57, Noes 40, Paired 2 |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-02-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 35 |
2016-02-16 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Billings, Wachs, Jorgensen, Hesselbein and Berceau |
2016-02-16 | House | Read a second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-16-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and referred to committee on Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2016-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Colleges and Universities, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive session held |
2016-01-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2016-01-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Wachs, Billings, Berceau, Hesselbein and Jorgensen |
2016-01-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Wachs, Billings, Berceau, Hesselbein and Jorgensen |
2016-01-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2016-01-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced |