WI AB744 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 968.38 (2m) (intro.), 968.38 (2m) (a) and 968.38 (5) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: throwing or expelling a bodily substance at a public safety worker or prosecutor. (FE)
Title
Throwing or expelling a bodily substance at a public safety worker or prosecutor. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-01-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab744 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB744.pdf |