WI AB746 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 346.17 (5), 346.22 (1) (b), 346.43 (1) (b) 3., 346.49 (1) (c), 346.60 (3m) (a), 346.65 (5m) and 349.11 (10); to amend 346.43 (4) (a), 346.43 (4) (b), 346.49 (5) (a), 346.49 (5) (b), 346.89 (4m) and 349.06 (3); and to create 340.01 (15pu), 346.17 (5) (b), 346.22 (1) (b) 2., 346.43 (1) (b) 3. b., 346.49 (1) (c) 2., 346.60 (3m) (a) 2., 346.65 (5m) (b) and 349.11 (10) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: traffic violations when emergency or roadside response vehicles are present and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Traffic violations when emergency or roadside response vehicles are present and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-26 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-03-26 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-03-25 | House | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor |
2020-02-25 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-24 | House | Representative Spreitzer added as a coauthor |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2020-01-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab746 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB746.pdf |