WI AB747 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 97.25 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: using milk producer affidavits to substantiate claims that a dairy product is free of synthetic bovine growth hormone.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Using milk producer affidavits to substantiate claims that a dairy product is free of synthetic bovine growth hormone.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-02-20HouseLaid on the table
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:45 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2020-02-04HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-29HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-16HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
2020-01-16HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback