WI AB75 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-5)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 66.0409 (3) (b); and to create 66.0409 (3) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: local regulation of honorary firearm discharges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local regulation of honorary firearm discharges.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 124
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-19SenateSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-11-12SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-11-12HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-11-12HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-11-12HouseRules suspended
2019-11-12HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-11-12HouseRead a second time
2019-11-07HousePlaced on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-11-07HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-11-07HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0
2019-10-29HouseExecutive action taken
2019-10-03HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-07HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback