WI AB76 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-5)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 46-5)
Status: Failed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-12 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 146.40 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: hours of instructional program for nurse aides.
Title
Hours of instructional program for nurse aides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-15 - House - Assembly: Refused to pass [Free Text] notwithstanding the objections of the Governor (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2020-01-15 | House | Refused to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-20 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 11-20-2019 |
2019-11-14 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-14-2019 by directive of the Speaker |
2019-11-13 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-13-2019 |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2019-10-09 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-05-15 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 66, Noes 31 |
2019-05-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-05-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-05-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 63, Noes 34 |
2019-05-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Gruszynski, Haywood, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kolste, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, L. Myers, Neubauer, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2019-05-15 | House | Read a second time |
2019-05-09 | House | Placed on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-05-08 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2019-04-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-25 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2019-03-25 | House | Representative Zimmerman added as a coauthor |
2019-03-19 | House | Senator Schachtner added as a cosponsor |
2019-03-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced |