WI AB771 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.11 (4) (b) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: leasing tax exempt property of a church or religious organization to an educational association. (FE)
Title
Leasing tax exempt property of a church or religious organization to an educational association. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Wittke [R] | Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R] | Rep. Tip McGuire [D] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:51 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 9, Noes 3 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Riemer and Haywood |
2020-02-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Riemer and Haywood |
2020-02-03 | House | Senator Carpenter withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-01-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-23 | House | Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor |
2020-01-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab771 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB771.pdf |