WI AB773 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Published 4-4-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 426.110 (5) to (13); to renumber 802.06 (1), 803.08 (2), 804.01 (2) (e) 1., 893.93 (1) (a) and 893.93 (1) (b); to renumber and amend 803.08 (1) and 804.09 (2) (a); to amend 138.04, 218.0125 (7), 218.0126, 426.110 (16), 628.46 (1), 801.01 (2), 804.01 (1), 804.01 (2) (e) 2., 804.01 (2) (e) 3., 804.01 (3) (a) 2., 804.01 (4), 804.09 (2) (b) 1., 804.12 (1) (a), 893.53, 893.89 (1) and 893.89 (3) (b); and to create 100.56, 177.30 (6), 426.110 (4m), 802.06 (1) (b), 803.08 (1) (a) to (e), 803.08 (3) to (10), 803.08 (12) to (15), 804.01 (2) (am), 804.01 (2) (bg), 804.01 (2) (e) 1g., 804.01 (2m), 804.01 (8), 804.09 (2) (a) 3. and 893.93 (1m) (intro.) of the statutes; Relating to: discovery of information in court proceedings; procedural requirements relating to class actions; consumer lawsuit lending; the statute of limitations for certain civil actions; agreements by the secretary of revenue to allow third-party audits related to unclaimed property; interest rates for overdue insurance claims; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Discovery of information in court proceedings; procedural requirements relating to class actions; consumer lawsuit lending; the statute of limitations for certain civil actions; agreements by the secretary of revenue to allow third-party audits related to unclaimed property; interest rates for overdue insurance claims; and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in as amended (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 34 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Published 4-4-2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-3-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 235 |
2018-04-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-2-2018 |
2018-03-29 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-22 | House | Senate Amendment 1 concurred in |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to calendar of 3-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2018-03-21 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Amendment 1 adopted) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Placed on the calendar of 3-20-2018 following Assembly Bill 843 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-20-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Wanggaard |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Printed engrossed by the direction of the Senate Chief Clerk-5606 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adopted |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 34 |
2018-02-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Wachs, Hebl and C. Taylor |
2018-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-21 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:59 PM on 2-22-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2018-02-20 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2018-02-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Tusler |
2018-02-19 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Born |
2018-01-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-29 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Tusler and Horlacher |
2018-01-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2018-01-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-12-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-12-19 | House | Introduced |