WI AB779 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Read first time and referred to committee on Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 118.133 (1) (a), 118.133 (1) (b) and 118.133 (2); and to create 118.133 (1) (c) of the statutes; Relating to: participation in interscholastic athletics and extracurricular activities. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Participation in interscholastic athletics and extracurricular activities. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Education
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 64, Noes 35
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-19HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Allen
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:52 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 6
2020-02-12HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-06HousePublic hearing held
2020-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-01-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback