WI AB784 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Read first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry
Pending: Senate Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: modifying administrative rules relating to the use of wood to contain bear bait in stumps.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying administrative rules relating to the use of wood to contain bear bait in stumps.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Sporting Heritage, Mining and Forestry
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRepresentative Jagler added as a coauthor
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:53 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Stafsholt
2020-02-12HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-12HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0
2020-02-04HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-31HouseRepresentative Milroy added as a coauthor
2020-01-30HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2020-01-30HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback