WI AB785 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 14.16 (17) of the statutes; Relating to: creating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day.
Title
Creating Hmong-Lao Veterans Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Decision of the Chair upheld (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senator Bernier added as a cosponsor |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-20 | House | Representatives Subeck and Zamarripa added as coauthors |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 63, Noes 36 |
2020-02-20 | House | Decision of the Chair appealed |
2020-02-20 | House | Point of order that Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 not germane under Assembly Rule 54 (3)(f) well taken |
2020-02-20 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, Anderson, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Cabrera, Considine, Crowley, Emerson, Fields, Goyke, Haywood, Hebl, Kolste, McGuire, B. Meyers, Milroy, L. Myers, Neubauer, Riemer, Pope, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Stubbs, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vining, Vruwink and Zamarripa |
2020-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:54 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-02-13 | House | Representatives Petryk and Hesselbein added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2020-01-22 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced |