WI AB786 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Public hearing held
Pending: Senate Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 46.977 (2) (a) and 54.15 (8) (a) 1. to 4.; to renumber and amend 46.977 (1) (b); to consolidate, renumber and amend 46.977 (1) (intro.) and (a); to amend 46.977 (2) (b) (intro.), 46.977 (2) (c), 54.15 (8) (a) (intro.) and 54.15 (8) (b); and to create 46.977 (3), 54.15 (8) (a) 2m. and 54.26 of the statutes; Relating to: guardian training requirements and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardian training requirements and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenatePublic hearing held
2020-03-05SenateSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2020-02-28SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Universities, Technical Colleges, Children and Families
2020-02-21SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-20HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-20HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 99, Noes 0
2020-02-20HouseRules suspended
2020-02-20HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 4 adopted
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 3 adopted
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2020-02-20HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-20HouseWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up
2020-02-20HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2020-02-20HouseRead a second time
2020-02-19HouseAssembly Amendment 4 offered by Representative Zimmerman
2020-02-18HouseMade a special order of business at 10:55 AM on 2-20-2020 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2020-02-18HouseReport Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2020-02-18HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2020-02-18HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2020-02-14HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-07HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-06HouseRepresentative Emerson added as a coauthor
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-05HouseAssembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Zimmerman
2020-02-05HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Zimmerman
2020-02-04HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Zimmerman
2020-01-30HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-27HouseWithdrawn from committee on Family Law and referred to committee on Judiciary pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c)
2020-01-24HouseRepresentative Kulp added as a coauthor
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Stubbs added as a coauthor
2020-01-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Family Law
2020-01-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback