WI AB788 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 450.062 (intro.); to renumber 450.062 (1) to (4); to renumber and amend 450.09 (2); to amend 450.06 (1), 450.06 (2) (b), 450.06 (2m), 450.09 (1) (a) and 450.09 (2) (title); and to create 450.01 (21c), 450.02 (5) and 450.09 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: licensing and regulation of pharmacies and remote dispensing sites under the pharmacy practice law, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Licensing and regulation of pharmacies and remote dispensing sites under the pharmacy practice law, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] |
Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Health and Human Services, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Human Services |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Murphy |
2020-02-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2020-02-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab788 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB788.pdf |