WI AB789 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to repeal 281.75 (2) (e), 281.75 (9) (a), 281.75 (11) (a) 8. and 281.75 (11) (ae); to renumber and amend 281.75 (5) (f) and 281.75 (9) (b); to amend 281.75 (7) (c) 7. and 281.75 (11m); and to create 20.370 (6) (cb), 281.75 (5) (f) 2., 281.75 (7) (d) and 281.75 (9) (am), (bm), (c) and (d) of the statutes; Relating to: the well compensation grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The well compensation grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-20SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-19SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-18HouseRepresentative Hesselbein added as a coauthor
2020-02-18HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 97, Noes 0
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended
2020-02-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-18HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2020-02-18HouseRead a second time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2020-02-13HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 13, Noes 3
2020-02-12HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-10HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2020-02-10HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2020-02-10HouseReport Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 8, Noes 4
2020-02-07HouseSenator Miller added as a cosponsor
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-05HouseRepresentative Plumer added as a coauthor
2020-02-05HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Novak
2020-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-04HousePublic hearing held
2020-02-03HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Considine, B. Meyers and Vruwink
2020-01-24HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development
2020-01-24HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback