WI AB793 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 281.665 (5) (c) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: priorities and criteria for the municipal flood control and riparian restoration program and amending administrative rules. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Priorities and criteria for the municipal flood control and riparian restoration program and amending administrative rules. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-20SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-19SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-18HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 37
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended
2020-02-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-18HouseRead a second time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on calendar 2-18-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-13HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 7, Noes 4
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-01-30HouseRepresentative Wichgers added as a coauthor
2020-01-30HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-30HouseRepresentative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor
2020-01-24HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Environment
2020-01-24HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback