WI AB804 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Published 2-29-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 940.45 (7) of the statutes; Relating to: intimidating a victim of domestic abuse and providing a penalty.
Title
Intimidating a victim of domestic abuse and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 67 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Published 2-29-2020 |
2020-02-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 2-28-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 112 |
2020-02-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator L. Taylor |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 67, Noes 32 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-11 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2020-02-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 5 |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-05 | House | Representative Brandtjen added as a coauthor |
2020-02-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Knodl |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced |