WI AB806 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 2-28-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 938.34 (4h) (a) and 938.34 (4m) (b) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: acts for which a juvenile may be placed in correctional placement or the Serious Juvenile Offender Program. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Acts for which a juvenile may be placed in correctional placement or the Serious Juvenile Offender Program. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseReport vetoed by the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25HousePresented to the Governor on 2-25-2020
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-12SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-11HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-11HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 60, Noes 38
2020-02-11HouseRules suspended
2020-02-11HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 61, Noes 37
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Goyke, Crowley, Hintz, Hesselbein, Spreitzer, Doyle, B. Meyers, McGuire, Neubauer, Fields, Pope, Ohnstad, Sargent, Subeck, Sinicki, C. Taylor, Vining, Emerson, Cabrera, Bowen, Brostoff and Stuck
2020-02-11HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2020-02-11HouseRead a second time
2020-02-06HousePlaced on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-06HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 6
2020-02-06HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 6
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-05HouseRepresentative Brandtjen added as a coauthor
2020-02-05HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Duchow
2020-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-02-04HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-01-30HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback