WI AB808 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Report vetoed by the Governor on 2-28-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 941.29 (4n) of the statutes; Relating to: prosecuting a violent felon for the crime of illegal possession of a firearm.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prosecuting a violent felon for the crime of illegal possession of a firearm.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-28HouseReport vetoed by the Governor on 2-28-2020
2020-02-25HousePresented to the Governor on 2-25-2020
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-14SenatePlaced on calendar 2-19-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
2020-02-14SenatePublic hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
2020-02-13SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-13SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-12SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-11HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-11HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 36
2020-02-11HouseRules suspended
2020-02-11HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-11HouseRead a second time
2020-02-06HousePlaced on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules
2020-02-06HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-06HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 9, Noes 5
2020-02-06HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-05HouseRepresentative Brandtjen added as a coauthor
2020-01-30HousePublic hearing held
2020-01-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback